blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2775183

EP2775183 - Microfluidic rotary valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Daub, Martina
Bismarckstrasse 69
71287 Weissach / DE
02 / Brettschneider, Thomas
Hoffmannstr. 204
71229 Leonberg / DE
 [2014/37]
Application number, filing date14154824.812.02.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateDE20131020365604.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013203656
[2014/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2775183
Date:10.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2775183
Date:19.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2016
ClassificationIPC:F16K99/00, B01L3/00
[2016/42]
CPC:
F16K99/0013 (EP); B01L3/502738 (EP); F16K99/0015 (EP);
F16K99/0026 (EP); B01L2200/0689 (EP); B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/0887 (EP); B01L2400/0644 (EP); B01L2400/0655 (EP);
F16K2099/0071 (EP); F16K2099/008 (EP); F16K2099/0084 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2014/37]F16K99/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Former [2014/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mikrofluidisches Drehventil[2014/37]
English:Microfluidic rotary valve[2014/37]
French:Soupape rotative microfluidique[2014/37]
Examination procedure19.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
20.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/45]
31.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2017/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007016692  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10,13 * page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1-6a * * page 8, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 9, paragraph 1 *;
 [XAI]WO2007060523  (MYCROLAB P L [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12,13 * page 2, lines 21-22; figures 27,34 * * page 24, lines 24-31 * * page 36, lines 3-5 * * page 43, lines 9-16 * [A] 6 [I] 4,5,8,10;
 [X]US2008249510  (MESCHER MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0076]; figures 5-7c *;
 [E]WO2014123600  (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [E] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * page 22, lines 15-31; figures 1a-9b *
by applicantDE102008002675
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.