EP2804139 - Server system for managing sequences for agricultural machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grevinga, Markus Heckenweg 77 48369 Saerbeck / DE | 02 /
Losch, Michael Neue Wiese 14 a 33775 Versmold / DE | 03 /
Eggenhaus, Georg Imkerweg 21 48369 Saerbeck / DE | 04 /
Klüber, Victor Wöstering 63 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 05 /
Jeppe, Eckehardt Ehlener Str. 54 34289 Zierenberg / DE | 06 /
Brill, Volker Stadtweg 7 33758 Schloß-Holte / DE | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14155002.0 | 13.02.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | DE20131008339 | 16.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013008339 | [2014/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804139 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/02 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06Q50/02 (EP,US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Serversystem zur Verwaltung von Sequenzen für landwirtschaftliche Arbeitsmaschinen | [2014/47] | English: | Server system for managing sequences for agricultural machines | [2014/47] | French: | Système de serveur pour l'administration de séquences pour des machines agricoles | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/07] | 07.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/07] | Appeal following examination | 18.08.2017 | Appeal received No. T2598/17 | 14.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.09.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2021/38] | 07.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE10250694 (CNH OESTERREICH GMBH SANKT VAL [AT]) [ID] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] *; | [I]EP1741329 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [I]EP1902606 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] * | by applicant | DE10250694 |