Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2767824

EP2767824 - Method and device for detecting analytes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
22.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2017/52]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Jans, Hilde
c/o IMEC VZW
IP department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
02 / Shioi, Masahiko
Panasonic
c/o IMEC VZW
IP department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
03 / Jans, Karolien
c/o IMEC VZW
IP department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
04 / Lagae, Liesbet
c/o IMEC VZW
IP department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]01 / Jans, Hilde
IMEC
IP department
c/o IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
02 / Shioi, Masahiko
Panasonic
c/o IMEC
IP department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
03 / Jans, Karolien
IMEC
IP department
c/o IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
04 / Lagae, Liesbet
IMEC
IP department
c/o IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Representative(s)Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa , et al
DenK iP bvba
Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116
9820 Merelbeke / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa , et al
DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1114
9820 Merelbeke / BE
Application number, filing date14155046.713.02.2014
[2014/34]
Priority number, dateUS201361765367P15.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361765367 P
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2767824
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/65, A61K49/00
[2019/04]
Former International [2014/34]G01N21/65
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Nachweis von Analyten[2014/34]
English:Method and device for detecting analytes[2014/34]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détection d'analytes[2014/34]
Examination procedure12.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
30.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2019Fee for grant paid
20.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6750311  (VAN ANTWERP WILLIAM PETER [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 19 - column 3, line 21 * * column 10, line 14 * * column 11, line 29 * * column 16, line 17 * * column 16, line 50 - column 16, line 51 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2161575  (UNIV AKRON [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] *;
 [A]US2002026108  (COLVIN ARTHUR E [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013035567  (STRANO MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - KIM R ROGERS, "Affinity-Based Biosensors 109 MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY Principles of Affinity-Based Biosensors", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20000101), vol. 14, pages 109 - 129, XP055111096 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *