Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2768079

EP2768079 - Spring clamp for conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Holterhoff, Klaus
Holunderweg 3
57462 Olpe / DE
02 / Diekmann, Torsten
Rebhuhnweg 4
33618 Leopoldshöhe / DE
03 / Bönsch, Matthias
An der Windflöte 5a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
04 / Stükerjürgen, Karl-Heinz
Friedhofsweg 8
33415 Verl / DE
05 / Salomon, Thomas
Hermann-Vogelsang-Str. 16
33330 Gütersloh / DE
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/34]
Application number, filing date14155168.914.02.2014
[2014/34]
Priority number, dateDE201320100740U19.02.2013         Original published format: DE 202013100740 U
[2014/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2768079
Date:20.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2768079
Date:17.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2014/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Federkraftklemme für Leiter[2014/34]
English:Spring clamp for conductor[2014/34]
French:Borne de connexion électrique à ressort[2014/34]
Examination procedure10.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/12]
20.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2017Fee for grant paid
04.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.2018  23.02.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Patentanwälte
Huyssenallee 100
45128 Essen / DE
 [2019/20]
Former [2018/13]
Opponent(s)01  15.02.2018   
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
02.03.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.07.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE14.02.2018
LU14.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE14.02.2018
LU14.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
LU14.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE3302372  (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * page 9 - page 11; figures 2,3 * [Y] 5-7 [I] 2-4,8;
 [XI]DE3237787  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,7,9,10 * column 2; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,8;
 [XYI]DE3019149  (PHOENIX ELEKT [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,11,13,14 * page 12 - page 13; figure 1 * [Y] 15 [I] 12;
 [YA]EP2466689  (BJB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * figures 1-5 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0303818  (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1-4,8 * figure 1 *;
 [YA]US2011207361  (HECKERT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 15 * figure 4b * [A] 1
by applicantUS7997915
OppositionDE3019149
 EP1780831
 EP1555723
 DE102004001202
 DE102010054679
 DE202011051466U
 DE102007051697
 DE102008039232
 DE102011012021