Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779239

EP2779239 - Methods and apparatus to provide transient event protection for circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/38]Methods and apparatus to provide transient event protection for circuits
[2019/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - English titlepublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/33]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHI, Fong
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2019/33]
Former [2014/38]01 / Shi, Fong
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Representative(s)Shipp, Nicholas , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2014/38]Shipp, Nicholas , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14155244.814.02.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131382945114.03.2013         Original published format: US201313829451
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779239
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2779239
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/02, H02H9/04, G06F17/50
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von vorübergehendem Ereignisschutz für Schaltungen[2019/31]
English:Methods and apparatus to provide transient event protection for circuits[2019/33]
French:Procédés et appareil pour fournir une protection contre les événements transitoires dans un circuit[2019/31]
Former [2014/38]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von vorübergehendem Ereignisschutz für Schaltungen
Former [2014/38]Methods and apparatus to provide transient event protection for circuits
Former [2014/38]Procédés et appareil pour fournir une protection contre les événements transitoires dans un circuit
Examination procedure14.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019
31.01.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.06.2019Fee for grant paid
25.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.07.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
08.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19182420.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2001043449  (OKUSHIMA MOTOTSUGU [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0070] - [0111] - [0113] - [0122] - [0131] * [I] 13-18;
 [IA]US2009094568  (SHUKLA VRASHANK GURUDATTA [IN], et al) [I] 13-18 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 1-12
 [XAI]  - ALBERT Z H WANG ET AL, "An On-Chip ESD Protection Circuit with Low Trigger Voltage in BiCMOS Technology", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20010101), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9200, XP011061436 [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document * [A] 5,6 [I] 4,7,9-18