Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810638

EP2810638 - Antiperspirant active compositions having SEC chromatogram exhibiting high SEC peak 4 intensity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2018/10]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pan, Long
9 Black Latch Lane
Cherry Hill, NJ New Jersey 08003 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/10]
Former [2014/50]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date14155256.212.12.2008
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateWO2007US8714512.12.2007         Original published format: PCT/US2007/087145
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810638
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810638
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/44, A61K8/28, A61K8/26, A61Q15/00
[2017/17]
Former International [2014/50]A61K8/26, A61K8/28, A61Q15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Schweißhemmende aktive Zusammensetzungen mit SEC-Chromatogramm mit hoher SEC-Peak-4-Intensität[2014/50]
English:Antiperspirant active compositions having SEC chromatogram exhibiting high SEC peak 4 intensity[2014/50]
French:Compositions antitranspirantes actives présentant un chromatogramme SEC ayant un SEC peak 4 à intensité élevée[2014/50]
Examination procedure14.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
09.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.07.2017Fee for grant paid
27.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08859061.7  / EP2229136
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080859061) is  27.04.2012
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/39]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US6074632  (SHEN YAN-FEI [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 55 - line 63 * * column 3, line 39 - line 50 * * column 2, line 55 - line 65 * * tables 4,5,6 *;
 [X]US2005265939  (LI ZIJUN [US]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0012] , [0 13] * * tables I,II,III * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US2007020211  (LI ZIJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0037] * * tables II,III,IV,V * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US2007196303  (LI ZIJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0027] , [0033] *;
 [X]WO2006091417  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] *;
 [T]  - Anonymous, "Roll-ons Reheis", (20141020), Reheis, URL: http://www.summitreheis.com/products/7/, (20141020), XP002731359 [T] * Chlorhydrol 50 *
by applicantUS6682749
 EP0291334
    - DR. ALLAN H. ROSENBERG, Cosmetics and Toiletries Worldwide, K: ASTON PUBLISHING GROUP, (1993), vol. 252, pages 254 - 256