Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774900

EP2774900 - Coating additive for coating fire resistant products containing carbon and/or silicon carbide and use of the offset [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Refratechnik Holding GmbH
Adalperostrasse 82
85737 Ismaning / DE
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / ROLLMANN, Steffen
Hauptstraße 8
56637 Plaidt / DE
02 / KESSELHEIM, Bertram
Im Vogelsang 3
53557 Bad Hönningen / DE
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2016/31]
Former [2014/37]Solf, Alexander
Patentanwälte
Dr. Solf und Zapf
Candidplatz 15
D-81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date14155374.317.02.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateDE2013100372205.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013003722
[2014/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2774900
Date:10.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2774900
Date:03.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C04B41/85, C04B41/86, C04B41/00, C04B41/50, C04B35/101, C04B35/14, C04B35/48, C04B35/634, C04B111/00, C04B28/00, C04B28/34, C04B35/66, C04B35/185, C04B35/565, C04B35/622, C04B35/63, C04B35/636, C04B35/18
[2015/52]
Former International [2014/37]C04B28/00, C04B28/26, C04B28/34, C04B35/66, C04B35/10, C04B35/106, C04B35/16, C04B35/185, C04B35/565, C04B35/622, C04B35/63, C04B35/636
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:Beschichtungsversatz zur Beschichtung Kohlenstoff- und/oder Siliciumcarbid haltiger feuerfester Erzeugnisse sowie Verwendung des Versatzes[2014/37]
English:Coating additive for coating fire resistant products containing carbon and/or silicon carbide and use of the offset[2014/37]
French:Embout de revêtement pour le revêtement de produits ignifugés contenant du carbure de carbone et/ou de silicium et utilisation de l'embout[2014/37]
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
08.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2016Fee for grant paid
12.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2014
Opposition(s)04.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.02.2014
AL03.08.2016
CY03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
MT03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU17.02.2014
AL03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
MT03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/46]AL03.08.2016
CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
MT03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
MT03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
IE17.02.2017
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/07]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
LU17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
MC03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/37]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SI03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/32]CZ03.08.2016
DK03.08.2016
EE03.08.2016
FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
RO03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
SK03.08.2016
SM03.08.2016
BG03.11.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/13]FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
LV03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
PT05.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI03.08.2016
HR03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
RS03.08.2016
SE03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
IS03.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI03.08.2016
LT03.08.2016
NO03.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT03.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB1356264  (FOSECO INT) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9-11;
 [XI]GB1156445  (STEEL CASTINGS RES AND TRADE A) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9-11;
 [XI]CN102020480  (PANZHIHUA WANTENG REFRACTORY MATERIALS CO LTD) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 9;
 [A]BG50552  (PREDPRIJATIE ELPROM) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP2690078
 US4780142
by applicantDE3485986T