Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809075

EP2809075 - Method and apparatus of channel switching using pre-acquisited PSI tables [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.09.2016  [2016/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Humax Co., Ltd.
Humax Village
216, Hwangsaeul-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 463-875 / KR
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Tae Gap
Suite 201, 4-6, 139 beon-gil, Sanwoon-ro
Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si
463-440 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date14155640.718.02.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2013005173908.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130051739
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809075
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2809075
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/2362, H04N21/426, H04N21/433, H04N21/438, H04N21/462
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung einer Kanalschaltung durch Verwendung vorerfasster PSI Tabellen[2014/49]
English:Method and apparatus of channel switching using pre-acquisited PSI tables[2014/49]
French:Procédé et appareil de commutation de canal utilisant des tables PSI pré-acquises[2014/49]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
02.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/37]
12.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6016172  (HUH JUN-HO [KR]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,10;
 [Y]US2004181813  (OTA TAKAAKI [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,3,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0094] *;
 [Y]US2012236933  (SAITOH KENSAKU [JP] ET AL) [Y] 2,3,10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0091]; figures 1,2, 4, 5 *