Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784665

EP2784665 - Program and version control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Ohtake, Tomohiro
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
02 / Kodaka, Toshihiro
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/38]
Former [2014/40]Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date14155734.819.02.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013006779028.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013067790
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784665
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784665
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F17/30
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/40]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Programm und Versionskontrollverfahren[2014/40]
English:Program and version control method[2014/40]
French:Programme et procédé de contrôle de version[2014/40]
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2015Fee for grant paid
28.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.02.2014
AL16.09.2015
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU19.02.2014
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU19.02.2014
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU19.02.2014
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU19.02.2014
AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/47]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/10]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE19.02.2016
LU19.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.09.2015
BE16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU19.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU19.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU19.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
IT16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT16.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[IY]  - Ueli Wahli, Jennie Brown,Matti Teinonen, Leif Trulsson, "Software Configuration Management, A Clear Case for IBM Rational, ClearCase and ClearQuest UCM", (20040401), pages 33 - 51, URL: www.redbooks.ibm.com/redbooks/pdfs/sg246399.pdf, (20140402), XP002722772 [I] 1-5 * Figure 4-8, page 42: * [Y] 4
 [Y]  - Jon Loeliger, "Version Control with Git", (20090501), pages FP-X,149 - 166, URL: www.foo.be/cours/.../OReilly%20Version%20Control%20with%20GIT.pdf, (20140402), XP002722807 [Y] 4 * Chapter 10, Altering Commits, page 149, line 11 *
by applicantJPH0997171