Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775625

EP2775625 - Capacitive position switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
K.A. Schmersal Holding GmbH & Co. KG
Moeddinghofe 30
42279 Wuppertal / DE
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Langerfeld, Ralf
Goethestrasse 16
42499 Hückeswagen / DE
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Kalkoff & Partner
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
[2014/37]
Application number, filing date14155859.320.02.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateDE20131010223706.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013102237
[2014/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775625
Date:10.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2775625
Date:13.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/24]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2775625
Date:19.09.2018
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/975
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/24]
Former [2014/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kapazitiver Positionsschalter[2014/37]
English:Capacitive position switch[2014/37]
French:Capteur de position capacitif[2014/37]
Examination procedure19.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/14]
28.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.04.2018Fee for grant paid
10.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.05.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
03.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2017
Opposition(s)14.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
NO13.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009086879  (OGATA MASAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 9, 20 *;
 [AD]DE102007038225  (RECHNER IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 *