blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2775625 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2775625



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 301
17.04.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.07.2018 Communication concerning correction of publication errors in European patent specification Search / examination 1
17.07.2018 Letter concerning publication issues Search / examination 2
03.07.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
03.07.2018 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
03.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
03.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
24.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
10.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
10.04.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.04.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.04.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
19.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
19.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
23.11.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
20.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
20.10.2017 Description Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
28.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
02.06.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
20.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.02.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
19.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.02.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.09.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.08.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.05.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
26.05.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
06.05.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Priority document Search / examination 23
20.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
20.02.2014 Description Search / examination 14
20.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 3
20.02.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 6
20.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4