blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2775625


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
19.04.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
17.08.2018 Correction of patent specification published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
11.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
04.05.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.04.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.04.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
17.04.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.11.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.02.2015 Change - designated states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
27.02.2015 Change - request for examination published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
09.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
22.08.2014 Change - inventor published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
08.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]