blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2775625
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2775625Global Dossier 19.09.2018B9
EP2775625 13.06.2018B1
EP2775625 10.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013102237 06.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013102237 19.03.2015B4
DE102013102237 11.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013102237 06.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2687023T 23.10.2018T3
Priority number Date
DE102013102237 06.03.2013