Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2770310

EP2770310 - Wavelength variable interference filter, optical filter device, optical module, and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.08.2017  [2017/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Sakashita, Tomoki
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano 392-8502 / JP
02 / Shinto, Susumu
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano 392-8502 / JP
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date14155919.520.02.2014
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateJP2013003293522.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013032935
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2770310
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2770310
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/26, G01J3/42, G01J3/51
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/35]
Former [2014/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wellenlängenvariabler Interferenzfilter, optische Filtervorrichtung, optisches Modul und elektronische Vorrichtung[2014/35]
English:Wavelength variable interference filter, optical filter device, optical module, and electronic apparatus[2014/35]
French:Filtre d'interférence de longueur d'onde variable, filtre optique, module optique et appareil électronique[2014/35]
Examination procedure20.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/35]
21.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/35]
24.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XIY]US2012257280  (SANO AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 7 * figures 3,4 * [I] 1,4,6,8-10 [Y] 2-3,5;
 [Y]JPS54126049  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4663494  (KISHI YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,5 * figures 11,14 * * column 10, line 7 - line 22 *;
 [A]US2012300208  (SANO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *