Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2769914

EP2769914 - Main landing gear compact axle steering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
4 Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
4 Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte
North Carolina 28217-4578 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Martin, Dennis W.
19506 NE 162nd Street
Woodinville, WA Washington 98077 / US
02 / Acks, James
2484 Sharon Copley Road
Medina, OH Ohio 44256 / US
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date14156248.821.02.2014
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateUS20131377421822.02.2013         Original published format: US201313774218
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2769914
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2769914
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B64C25/34, B64C25/50
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/29]
Former [2014/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kompakte Achslenkung für Hauptfahrwerk[2014/35]
English:Main landing gear compact axle steering[2014/35]
French:Direction d'essieu compact de train d'atterrissage principal[2014/35]
Examination procedure06.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/29]
27.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2366623  (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9-11,13,14 * paragraph [0020]; figure - * [Y] 12,15;
 [XY]GB697937  (DOWTY EQUIPMENT LTD) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 14-93; figure - * [Y] 12,15;
 [X]GB560659  (MACLAREN UNDERCARRIAGE COMPANY, et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * page 3, lines 39-91; figure - *;
 [A]WO2006071262  (GOODRICH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *