Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804234

EP2804234 - Rechargeable battery with insulation member having two insulation portions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-577 / KR
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Sung-Kab
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Legal & IP Team
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
449-577 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Yong-Sam
Legal and IP Team
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
449-577 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Park, Se-Jong
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Legal & IP Team
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
449-577 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Kim, Sung-Hoon
Legal & IP Team
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
449-577 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Jang, Myung-Jae
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Legal & IP Team
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
449-577 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date14156355.124.02.2014
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateUS201361823639P15.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361823639 P
US20141418082114.02.2014         Original published format: US201414180821
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804234
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804234
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/02, H01M2/32, H01M2/34, // H01M10/052
[2018/17]
Former International [2014/47]H01M2/02, // H01M10/052
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wiederaufladbare Batterie mit Isolationselement mit zwei Isolierungsteilen[2018/21]
English:Rechargeable battery with insulation member having two insulation portions[2014/47]
French:Batterie rechargeable avec élément d'isolation comportant deux parties d'isolation[2014/47]
Former [2014/47]Wiederaufladbare Batterie mit Vakuumisolationselement mit zwei Isolierungsteilen
Examination procedure18.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
29.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2018Fee for grant paid
29.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2016
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
SM15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2290732  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0061] , [0062] * [I] 2-15;
 [A]KR20120132353  (GS YUASA CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]US2012164501  (GUEN MINHYUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]EP2528131  (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-12 *
ExaminationUS2010310912