blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2804234


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.06.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.07.2019 [2019/30]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
13.07.2018 (Expected) grant published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.04.2018 Change - classification published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
20.04.2018 Change - classification published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
20.04.2018 Change - German title published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
23.03.2018 Change - classification published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
23.03.2018 Change - classification published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
27.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.08.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.04.2016 First examination report
29.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
20.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
18.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]