blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2804234 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410201999 EP14156355



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10014495Global Dossier 03.07.2018B2
US2014342220 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414180821 14.02.2014
US201361823639 15.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20140135096Global Dossier 25.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201414180821 14.02.2014
US201361823639 15.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6403426BGlobal Dossier 10.10.2018B2
JP2014225450 04.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201414180821 14.02.2014
US201361823639 15.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104167525Global Dossier 26.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201414180821 14.02.2014
US201361823639 15.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2804234Global Dossier 15.08.2018B1
EP2804234 19.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414180821 14.02.2014
US201361823639 15.05.2013