Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784406

EP2784406 - Volume flow regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wildeboer, Werner
Marker Weg 13 a
26826 Weener / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Dahms, Arne
Rathaustr. 6
26826 Weener / DE
02 / Harms, Thomas
Wulkjeweg 11
26605 Aurich / DE
 [2015/21]
Former [2014/40]01 / Dahme, Arne
Rathaustr. 6
26826 Weener / DE
02 / Harms, Thomas, Dipl. Ing.
Wulkjeweg 11
26605 Aurich / DE
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14156360.124.02.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateDE201320100885U01.03.2013         Original published format: DE 202013100885 U
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784406
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F24F13/14
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Volumenstromregler[2014/40]
English:Volume flow regulator[2014/40]
French:Régulateur de débit[2014/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
21.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE607229  (BOSCH ROBERT AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-15;
 [I]FR2276524  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US4246918  (DEAN RAYMOND H) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6082704  (GRINBERGS PETER KARL [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS4301833
 FR1313310
 EP1134507