Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2911259

EP2911259 - Use of a speed-controlled drive for network stabilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, GB
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2015/35]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wedel, Bernd
Schwalbenweg 40
91096 Möhrendorf / DE
02 / Buchstaller, Dominic
Loheweg 3
91056 Dechsendorf / DE
 [2015/35]
Application number, filing date14156363.524.02.2014
[2015/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2911259
Date:26.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2911259
Date:30.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/12, H02J3/14, H02J3/24
[2015/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/13]
Former [2015/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Nutzung eines drehzahlgeregelten Antriebs zur Netzstabilisierung[2015/35]
English:Use of a speed-controlled drive for network stabilisation[2015/35]
French:Utilisation d'un entraînement à régime régulé pour la stabilisation du réseau[2015/35]
Examination procedure16.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/13]
23.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.07.2017Fee for grant paid
20.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.05.2018  04.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
ABB AB
Forskargränd 7
72178 Västerås / SE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 [2018/28]
14.06.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.10.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MT30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
GB24.02.2018
IE24.02.2018
LU24.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MT30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
IE24.02.2018
LU24.02.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MT30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
LU24.02.2018
Former [2018/44]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
MT30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MT30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012226385  (WILLIAMS MICHAEL LAMAR [US]) [X] 1,5-7,10,14-16 * paragraphs [0079] - [0086] - [ 137] - paragraph [0153]; figures 10, 20, 24 *;
 [Y]US2004098171  (HORST GALE R [US]) [Y] 1,5,6,8-10,14,15,17,18 * paragraphs [0004] - [0026] - [0 39] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [Y]WO2011006828  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,10,13-15 * page 2, line 18 - page 6, line 25 *;
 [Y]DE102009003713  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,4,8-10,13,17,18 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2014012595  (WIRSOL SOLAR AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,10,13 * page 6, line 4 - line 24 *
Opposition   - HANS SCHLUNEGGER et al., "100 MW Full-Size Converter in the Grimsel 2 Pumped Storage Plant", Hydro 2013 International conference and Exhibition, (20131007), URL: http://www.hydropower-dams.com/pdfs/hydro2013.pdf, XP002759905