Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2770145

EP2770145 - Strike for T-shaped locking button [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERCO
2, rue du Vieux Moulin
57445 Reding / FR
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Charton, Bruno
28, Avenue de la Gare
10180 SAINT-LYE / FR
02 / Bour, Emmanuel
21, Rue du 21 Novembre
57445 REDING / FR
03 / Stosse, Michel
Lieu-dit Stutzkopf
57870 WALSCHEID / FR
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Rhein, Alain
CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN
17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date14156435.124.02.2014
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateFR2013005164825.02.2013         Original published format: FR 1351648
FR2013005440516.05.2013         Original published format: FR 1354405
[2014/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2770145
Date:27.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:E05C9/18, E05B15/02
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verschlussklappe für T-förmigen Rollzapfen[2014/35]
English:Strike for T-shaped locking button[2014/35]
French:Gache pour galet de verrouillage en T[2014/35]
Examination procedure25.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102004062558  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2448340  (AVOCET HARDWARE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 21 - page 10, line 6; figures 4-10 *;
 [A]EP2199510  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP2505744  (HAUTAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102004062558