Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2781712

EP2781712 - Vehicle component with insulation means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/39]Insulation means
[2017/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eberspächer Exhaust Technology GmbH & Co. KG
Homburger Strasse 95
66539 Neunkirchen / DE
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Neu, Markus
Max-Liebermann-Str. 23
66564 Ottweiler / DE
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date14156502.825.02.2014
[2014/39]
Priority number, dateDE20131020473218.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013204732
[2014/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2781712
Date:24.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2781712
Date:09.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:F01N13/14, F02B77/11, F16L59/14
[2017/14]
Former International [2014/39]F01N13/14, F02B77/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
Former [2014/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugbauteil mit einer Isolierung[2017/14]
English:Vehicle component with insulation means[2017/14]
French:Composant de véhicule avec dispositif d'isolation[2017/14]
Former [2014/39]Isolierung
Former [2014/39]Insulation means
Former [2014/39]Isolation
Examination procedure06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
10.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Fee for grant paid
27.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE25.02.2018
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU25.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1528231  (NICHIAS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure - * [I] 14,15;
 [X]JPS59136521  (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [X] 1,7,11-14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1772603  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 4,14 * abstract *;
 [X]EP2348206  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11,13 * figure 2 *;
 [X]DE3821468  (DIEDRICHS HELMUT W [DE]) [X] 1-11,13 * figure - *