blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2781712


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
15.06.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
07.07.2017 (Expected) grant published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
05.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.07.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.07.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.03.2017 Change - classification published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - classification published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - German title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - English title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
03.03.2017 Change - French title published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
24.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.11.2016 First examination report
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2015 Change - designated states published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Change - request for examination published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
12.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
22.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]