blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2781712 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410098717 EP14156502



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9671056Global Dossier 06.06.2017B2
US2014262169 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013204732 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5860911BGlobal Dossier 16.02.2016B2
JP2014196740 16.10.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013204732 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104061405BGlobal Dossier 04.01.2017B
CN104061405 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013204732 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2781712Global Dossier 09.08.2017B1
EP2781712 24.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013204732 18.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013204732 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013204732 18.03.2013