Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772362

EP2772362 - Apparatus and method for non-contact manipulation, conditioning, shaping and drying of surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seccombe, S. Dana
645 Greenwich Lane
Foster City, CA 94404-3614 / US
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Application number, filing date14156505.125.02.2014
[2014/36]
Priority number, dateUS20131378291001.03.2013         Original published format: US201313782910
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2772362
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B41J11/00, B41J11/06, B41J3/60
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur berührungslosen Manipulation, Konditionierung, Formung und Trocknung von Oberflächen[2014/36]
English:Apparatus and method for non-contact manipulation, conditioning, shaping and drying of surfaces[2014/36]
French:Appareil et procédé de manipulation sans contact, conditionnement, formage et séchage de surfaces[2014/36]
Examination procedure25.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
04.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/36]
14.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/36]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE202005005878U  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 4-6 [I] 9,12,13;
 [X]US2010157006  (KANADA HIDEMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,13 * figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0160] *;
 [XI]GB668741  (SVENSKA FLAEKTFABRIKEN AB) [X] 1 * page 2, line 38 - line 57 * [I] 8,9;
 [X]US2006054774  (YASSOUR YUVAL [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102006032377  (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]EP0916915  (SOLARONICS [FR]) [A] 1,4-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6305796
 US6463674
 US6382850
 US5510822
 US8152262
 US6155670
    BAEHR, Heat and Mass Transfer, page 354,