Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792274

EP2792274 - Bracket with two stage support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Häfele GmbH & Co KG
Adolf-Häfele-Strasse 1
72202 Nagold / DE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Nitschmann, Gunter
Goethestr. 12
72202 Nagold / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/43]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14156601.825.02.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateDE201320101617U16.04.2013         Original published format: DE 202013101617 U
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792274
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792274
Date:24.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47B96/06
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fachbodenträger mit zweistufiger Abstützung[2014/43]
English:Bracket with two stage support[2014/43]
French:Porte tablette avec support à deux niveaux[2014/43]
Examination procedure19.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
02.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2015Fee for grant paid
10.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2014
Opposition(s)25.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.02.2014
AL24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
MT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
LU25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU25.02.2014
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
MT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
LU25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.02.2014
CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
MT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/16]CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
IE25.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/49]EE24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/38]FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
NL24.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE9100135U  (REGIO LADENBAU GMBH) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * figure 4 * [I] 8;
 [A]DE202007007637U  (RITZI GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202004000475U  (HAEFELE GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2336103  (LAUTENSCHLAEGER KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE20302306U  (G & G BESCHLAEGE GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *