Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787230

EP2787230 - Rolling bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Takeshi
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
02 / Ueno, Hiroshi
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/35]
Former [2014/41]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14156806.326.02.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateJP2013004082401.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013040824
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787230
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787230
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787230
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/66, F16C19/04, F16C41/00, F16C35/06, F16C35/04
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/41]F16C33/66, F16C19/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/09]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wälzlagervorrichtung[2014/41]
English:Rolling bearing device[2014/41]
French:Dispositif de roulement à rouleaux[2014/41]
Examination procedure15.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/09]
22.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.06.2018Fee for grant paid
29.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
16.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2018
Opposition(s)31.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2009148087  (SUZUKI KAZUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047]; figure 3 * [A] 5-7;
 [YA]EP1980840  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * sentence last, paragraph 39; figure 23 * [A] 5-7
by applicantJP2012102803