Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775254

EP2775254 - Side mounting for fixing an additional device to a weapon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2015  [2015/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kilic, Michael Ali
Heidenfelder Strasse 1
97525 Schwebheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
Kilic, Michael Ali
Hauptstrasse 26
97534 Waigolshausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 5
97080 Würzburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5
97080 Würzburg / DE
Application number, filing date14156981.427.02.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateDE2013100390808.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013003908
[2014/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775254
Date:10.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:F41G11/00, F41C27/00
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Seitenmontage zur Befestigung einer Zusatzeinrichtung an einer Waffe[2014/37]
English:Side mounting for fixing an additional device to a weapon[2014/37]
French:Montage latéral pour la fixation d'un dispositif supplémentaire à une arme[2014/37]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
11.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/39]
16.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/39]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008072471  (KENG DA [US]) [Y] 5-10 * figure - *;
 [Y]US4367606  (BECHTEL DANIEL L [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, lines 37-49 * * page 1; figure 1 *;
 [Y]AU1760767  (C. W. J. RUFUS) [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2345864  (INNOVATIVE WIRELESS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 3 * figures 1A,1C *;
 [A]TWM288680U  (SHIU YAU-SHI [TW]) [A] 1 * figure - *
 [I]  ANONYMOUS, "AK Side Railed Scope Mount", (20130119), Midwest Industries, URL: http://www.midwestindustriesinc.com/index.cfm?fuseaction=category.display&category_ID=433, (20140602), XP002725210 [I] 1-4 * the whole document *
    [] Anonymous, "IMAGE from Product: MIDWEST INDUSTRIES, INC. - AK-47/74 SCOPE MOUNT", BROWNELLS, URL: http://www.brownells.com/userdocs/products/t_100009103_5..jpg, (20140602), XP002726083 [ ] * the whole document *
    [] "MI AK Side Railed Scope Mount", Midwest Industries, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130119190856/http://midwestindustriesinc.com/index.cfm?fuseaction=category.display&category_id=433, (20140602), XP002726084 [ ] * To prove the publication on the web from XP002725210. *