Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775460

EP2775460 - Coin dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI SEIKO CO., LTD.
Aoyama Tower Bldg. 2F 2-24-15 Minami Aoyama Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0062 / JP
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Kurosawa, Motoharu
c/o Saitama Factory of Asahi Seiko Co., Ltd.
1-3-7, Kokaba, Iwatsuki-ku, Saitama-shi
Saitama-ken, Saitama / JP
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2014/37]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date14157059.827.02.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateJP2013004653408.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013046534
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775460
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2775460
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G07D9/00
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:Münzausgabevorrichtung[2014/37]
English:Coin dispenser[2014/37]
French:Distributeur de pièces[2014/37]
Examination procedure15.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
06.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2016Fee for grant paid
03.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2014
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.04.2016
AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2017/48]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005009464  (NIREKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 2, 3 *;
 [X]US5924919  (HIRANO YASUO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 27 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 52 * * column 9, line 3 - line 49 * * figures 3, 11 *;
 [X]US7798304  (TAKEUCHI TORU [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 32 - column 9, line 40 * * figure 7 *;
 [XD]JP2002150347  (ASAHI SEIKO CO LTD) [XD] 1-3 * the whole document *