blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2775460 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2775460



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 193
24.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.10.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
22.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
22.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Description Search / examination 4
22.12.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.10.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
15.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.05.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
24.03.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
27.02.2014 Description Search / examination 25
27.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 17
27.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4