blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2775460


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
24.02.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
18.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.02.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.10.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.11.2014 First examination report
09.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
08.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Amendment by applicant