blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2775460 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410083766 EP14157059



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5945752BGlobal Dossier 05.07.2016B2
JP2014174720 22.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013046534 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104036579BGlobal Dossier 04.05.2016B
CN104036579 10.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013046534 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2775460Global Dossier 20.04.2016B1
EP2775460 10.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013046534 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI509574B 21.11.2015B
TW201443828 16.11.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013046534 08.03.2013