Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783798

EP2783798 - Robot system and method for controlling robot system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kouno, Dai
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Tamio
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
03 / Suyama, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
04 / Nishimura, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
05 / Matsuo, Tomohiro
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
06 / Ishikawa, Shinichi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
07 / Kawano, Tomoki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14157155.428.02.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013005280715.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013052807
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783798
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783798
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16, G05B19/4061
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/40]B25J9/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Robotersystem und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Robotersystems[2014/40]
English:Robot system and method for controlling robot system[2014/40]
French:Système de robot et procédé pour commander un tel système[2014/40]
Examination procedure13.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/21]
24.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010054673  (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,13 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 1 * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 13 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 13 - line 20 * * page 5, line 4 - line 10 * * page 7, line 22 - line 28 * * page 8, line 9 - line 14 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 2 * * page 11, line 21 - line 27 * * figure 1 * [I] 2,5,6,8,11,12;
 [A]US6212443  (NAGATA HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006043861  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005003827  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - HENRICH D ET AL, "Modeling Intuitive behavior for safe human/robot coexistence cooperation", 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA) : ORLANDO, FLORIDA, 15 - 19 MAY 2006, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20060515), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642304, ISBN 978-0-7803-9505-3, pages 3929 - 3934, XP010921866 [X] 1,3,5,13 * section I; page 3929 * * section II; page 3930 * * section III; page 3930 * * section IV; page 3932 * * figures 1 - 5 * [I] 2,4,6-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642304
 [XI]  - BAERVELDT A-J, "Cooperation between man and robot: interface and safety", ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATION, 1992. PROCEEDINGS., IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TOKYO, JAPAN 1-3 SEPT. 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19920901), doi:10.1109/ROMAN.1992.253891, ISBN 978-0-7803-0753-7, pages 183 - 187, XP010066651 [X] 1-4,13 * section II; page 184 * * section III; page 186 * * figure 1 * * figure 4 * [I] 5-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROMAN.1992.253891