Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783800

EP2783800 - Robot system and method for controlling robot system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Suyama, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / Kouno, Dai
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
03 / Nakamura, Tamio
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
04 / Nishimura, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
05 / Matsuo, Tomohiro
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
06 / Ishikawa, Shinichi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
07 / Kawano, Tomoki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14157180.228.02.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013005280615.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013052806
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783800
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783800
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16, G05B19/4061
[2016/12]
Former International [2014/40]B25J9/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Robotersystem und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Robotersystems[2014/40]
English:Robot system and method for controlling robot system[2014/40]
French:Système de robot et procédé pour commander un tel système[2014/40]
Examination procedure23.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
25.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006049939  (HABERER MANFRED [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 * * figures 2a - 2c * * figures 3a - 3c *;
 [A]EP1901150  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10324627  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HENRICH D ET AL, "Modeling Intuitive behavior for safe human/robot coexistence cooperation", 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA) : ORLANDO, FLORIDA, 15 - 19 MAY 2006, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20060515), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642304, ISBN 978-0-7803-9505-3, pages 3929 - 3934, XP010921866 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2006.1642304