Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2738184

EP2738184 - Continuous take off technique and pressure control of polymerization reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.02.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP
10001 Six Pines Drive
The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US
[2014/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Hottovy, John D.
C/o Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP
10001 Six Pines Drive The Woodlands
Texas 77380 / US
 [2014/44]
Former [2014/24]01 / Hottovy, John D.
2347 Summit Way Court
Kingwood
Texas 77339 / US
Representative(s)Abel & Imray
Westpoint Building
James Street West
Bath BA1 2DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/23]Johnston, Magnus George
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date14157217.213.05.2011
[2014/23]
Priority number, dateUS2010078533321.05.2010         Original published format: US 785333
[2014/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2738184
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2738184
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00, C08F2/00
[2014/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
Former [2014/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontinuierliches Startverfahren und Druckregelung von Polymerisationsreaktoren[2014/23]
English:Continuous take off technique and pressure control of polymerization reactors[2014/23]
French:Technique de prélèvement en continu et contrôle de la pression des réacteurs de polymérisation[2014/23]
Examination procedure03.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
28.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2016Fee for grant paid
03.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11724839.3  / EP2571905
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2017  19.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Borealis AG, et al
Borealis Polyolefine GmbH
IPR-Department
St.-Peter-Straße 25
4021 Linz / AT
 [2018/50]
Former [2017/20]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2017   
Borealis AG
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Salminen, Hannu, et al
Borealis Polymers Oy
P.O. Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
23.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.09.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.04.2019Appeal received No.  T1168/19
14.06.2019Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
MK13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/46]AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
CY13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/46]AL13.07.2016
AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/21]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
GB13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
MC13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SI13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/31]AT13.07.2016
CZ13.07.2016
DK13.07.2016
EE13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RO13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
SK13.07.2016
SM13.07.2016
BG13.10.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
LV13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT13.07.2016
FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
GR14.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
PT14.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI13.07.2016
HR13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
PL13.07.2016
RS13.07.2016
SE13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
IS13.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI13.07.2016
IT13.07.2016
LT13.07.2016
NO13.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT13.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004122187  (VERSER DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]WO2010027912  (CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0072] *;
 [A]WO2004024780  (CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP2055725  (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0008] , [0017] - [0020] * * claim 1 *
OppositionWO2011146334
 WO2009027197
 WO9618662
 EP2186833
 EP1825910
 WO03074167
 EP0891990
 EP2055725
 EP0580930
 EP1415999
 EP1803498