Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790091

EP2790091 - Input device, computer-readable recording medium, and method for receiving input [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.07.2017  [2017/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Kashiwagi, Susumu
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Koike, Hideyuki
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14157504.303.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008417112.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013084171
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790091
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2790091
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Eingabevorrichtung, computerlesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium und Verfahren zum Eingabeempfang[2014/42]
English:Input device, computer-readable recording medium, and method for receiving input[2014/42]
French:Dispositif d'entrée, support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur et procédé de réception d'entrée[2014/42]
Examination procedure27.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
22.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
06.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[IA]US2011242038  (KAKUTA JUN [JP] ET AL) [I] 1,6,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0160] * [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15;
 [A]EP2112579  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0054] - [0056] *;
 [A]WO9611435  (SYNAPTICS INC [US]; GILLESPIE DAVID [US]; ALLEN TIMOTHY P [US]; WOLF R) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 56, paragraph l - page 57, paragraph first * * page 60, paragraph 2 * * page 79, paragraph 1 * * page 80, paragraph 1 * * page 81, paragraph 1 *
by applicantJP2004110388
 JP2008276276