blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2775401 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2775401



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 230
24.07.2019 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.07.2019 Statement of grounds Search / examination 9
04.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Notice of appeal Search / examination 2
08.04.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.04.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
04.04.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
04.04.2019 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.04.2019 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
04.04.2019 Means of redress Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.12.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.12.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
17.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
07.08.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
30.07.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.07.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
02.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
05.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
05.03.2014 Description Search / examination 14
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
05.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5