blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2775401


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.06.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
07.06.2019 New entry: Appeal number
03.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
26.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.01.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2018 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.01.2017 First examination report
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
08.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
09.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
05.09.2014 Publication of search report published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Change - classification published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Change - classification published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]