blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2775401 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410145269 EP14157830



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016054790Global Dossier 25.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313784950 05.03.2013
US201514929833 02.11.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9201487Global Dossier 01.12.2015B2
US2014258754 11.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313784950 05.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5792337BGlobal Dossier 07.10.2015B2
JP2014174995 22.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313784950 05.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104035540BGlobal Dossier 28.07.2017B
CN104035540 10.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313784950 05.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2775401Global Dossier 08.10.2014A3
EP2775401 10.09.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201313784950 05.03.2013