Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775401

EP2775401 - Reducing power consumption during graphics rendering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Akenine-Möller, Tomas G.
Rosenvägen 13
M, SE 227 38 Lund / SE
02 / Johnsson, Bjorn
Rönnebergavägen 9A
M, SE 24134 Eslöv / SE
03 / Andersson, Magnus
Kaprifolgatan 37
M, SE 25375 Helsingborg / SE
04 / Nilsson, Jim K.
Svenska vägen 4
M, SE 226 39 Lund / SE
05 / Toth, Robert M.
Parternas Gränd 65
M, SE 22647 Lund / SE
06 / Munkberg, Carl J.
Skomakaregatan 10A
M, SE 21134 Malmö / SE
07 / Hasselgren, Jon N.
Sparvvägen 4
M, SE 218 32 Bunkeflostrand / SE
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14157830.205.03.2014
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateUS20131378495005.03.2013         Original published format: US201313784950
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2775401
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2775401
Date:08.10.2014
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, G06T15/00, G06F9/50
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verringerung des Energieverbrauchs beim Grafikrendern[2014/37]
English:Reducing power consumption during graphics rendering[2014/37]
French:Réduction de la consommation d'énergie pendant un rendu graphique[2014/37]
Examination procedure31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
17.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
27.03.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.06.2019Appeal received
19.07.2019Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003233592  (LIN HUNG-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13-15 * paragraph [0025]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0027]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figure 6 * [I] 3,7,8,12;
 [A]US7903116  (KLOCK MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * column 4, lines 54-82 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2009309885  (SAMSON ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *