Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819488

EP2819488 - VCC Charge and Free-wheeling Detection via Source Controlled MOS Transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dialog Semiconductor GmbH
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim / DE
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Knoedgen, Horst
c/o Dialog Semiconductor GmbH
Industriestrasse 1
82110 Germering / DE
02 / Tyrrell, Julian
c/o Dialog Semiconductor Ltd.
Delta 200, Welton Road
Delta Business Park
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 7 XB / GB
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2015/01]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14157932.624.06.2013
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819488
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819488
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VCC-Ladungs- und Freilauferkennung über einen quellengesteuerten MOS-Transistor[2015/01]
English:VCC Charge and Free-wheeling Detection via Source Controlled MOS Transistor[2015/01]
French:Détection de charge et à roue libre VCC par l'intermédiaire d'un transistor MOS commandé par la source[2015/01]
Examination procedure12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
04.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2017Fee for grant paid
31.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13173450.1  / EP2819487
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20130173450) is  13.09.2016
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
GB24.06.2017
IE24.06.2017
LU24.06.2017
MT24.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
GB24.06.2017
IE24.06.2017
LU24.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/29]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
GB24.06.2017
IE24.06.2017
LU24.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
GB24.06.2017
IE24.06.2017
LU24.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
GB24.06.2017
LU24.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/11]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007070659  (SAWTELL CARL K [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047]; figure 6 *;
 [X]US2008265133  (SAWTELL CARL K [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US6643144  (FELDTKELLER MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,15 * column 9; figure 5 *;
 [A]US7115888  (HACHIYA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 7-10; figures 1, 2 *