Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783713

EP2783713 - Recirculation detection by bolus administration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Braun Avitum AG
Carl-Braun-Strasse 1
34212 Melsungen / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Ahrens, Jörn
Glücksburger Straße 39a
34225 Baunatal / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14157989.606.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateDE20131010322228.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013103222
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783713
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/36, A61M1/16
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rezirkulationsdetektion durch Bolusgabe[2014/40]
English:Recirculation detection by bolus administration[2014/40]
French:Détection de recirculation par bolus[2014/40]
Examination procedure05.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
20.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XDY]EP0900094  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0013] , [0015] , [0016] , [0023] , [0027] , [0034] , [0035] * * figure 1 * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]DE102011008482  (LDIAMON AS [EE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0019] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2292283  (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * figure 1; claim 4 *;
 [YD]US7815852  (STERNBY JAN PETER [SE]) [YD] 4,5 * column 5, lines 9-23 *;
 [A]US2006096348  (DIFIORE ATTILIO E [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 5 - page 10 * * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0900094
 US7815852
 US5685989
 DE69916053T