Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783714

EP2783714 - Method and device for determining a recirculation state [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Braun Avitum AG
Carl-Braun-Strasse 1
34212 Melsungen / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Wolff, Henrik
Vor der Schanze 22
37213 Witzenhausen / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14158083.706.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateDE20131010322028.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013103220
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783714
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783714
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/36, A61M1/16
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung eines Rezirkulationszustands[2014/40]
English:Method and device for determining a recirculation state[2014/40]
French:Procédé et dispositif de détermination d'un état de recirculation[2014/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
28.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2016Fee for grant paid
05.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]HU06.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU06.03.2014
AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XDA]EP0900094  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 10,11,13 * page 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1-9,12;
 [X]WO2011026647  (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE]; AHRENS JOERN [DE]; MOLL STEFAN [DE]; CASTELLAR) [X] 10-12 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2012062257  (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE]; WOLFF HENRIK [DE]; MOLL STEFAN [DE]) [X] 10-12 * page 3, lines 6-32 * * page 7, lines 20-29 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 25 * * page 17, lines 20-27 * * page 20, lines 23-25 * * page 29, line 31 - page 30, line 5 *;
 [X]WO9532010  (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 10 * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 24 * * page 8, lines 6-27 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 11 * * page 17, lines 9-21 * * pages 1,2 *;
 [A]DE102010015664  (UP MED GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0057] , [0058] , [0061] *;
 [AD]EP1083948  (ALTHIN MEDICAL AB [SE]) [AD] 10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002062098  (CAVICCHIOLI GIOVANNI [IT] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * figure 3 *
by applicantEP0900094
 US7815852
 US5685989
 EP1083948