EP2783714 - Method and device for determining a recirculation state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Carl-Braun-Strasse 1 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolff, Henrik Vor der Schanze 22 37213 Witzenhausen / DE | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14158083.7 | 06.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | DE201310103220 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013103220 | [2014/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783714 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2783714 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M1/16 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
A61M1/1615 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/1605 (US);
A61M1/3658 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2014/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung eines Rezirkulationszustands | [2014/40] | English: | Method and device for determining a recirculation state | [2014/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination d'un état de recirculation | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2014 | AL | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | MT | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IS | 18.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2014 | |
AL | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9532010 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 10 * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 24 * * page 8, lines 6-27 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 11 * * page 17, lines 9-21 * * pages 1,2 *; | [XDA]EP0900094 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 10,11,13 * page 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1-9,12; | [AD]EP1083948 (ALTHIN MEDICAL AB [SE]) [AD] 10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002062098 (CAVICCHIOLI GIOVANNI [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] ** figure 3 *; | [X]WO2011026647 (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE], et al) [X] 10-12 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE102010015664 (UP MED GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0057] , [0058] , [0061] *; | [X]WO2012062257 (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE], et al) [X] 10-12 * page 3, lines 6-32 * * page 7, lines 20-29 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 25 * * page 17, lines 20-27 * * page 20, lines 23-25 * * page 29, line 31 - page 30, line 5 * | by applicant | US5685989 | EP0900094 | EP1083948 | US7815852 |