Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783869

EP2783869 - Recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
[2018/32]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Terada, Kohei
c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intellectual Property Department
1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8562 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/32]
Former [2014/40]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date14158318.707.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007517329.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013075173
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783869
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783869
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783869
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B41J3/54, B41J13/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/12]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Recording apparatus[2014/40]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement[2014/40]
Examination procedure11.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/12]
22.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2018Fee for grant paid
02.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2018
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/37]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SI08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
ES08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
IT08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5208640  (HORIE KIYOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,9,12,13,15 * figure 3 * [Y] 11,18;
 [XY]US6938969  (SHIBASAKI SOUHEI [JP]) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 10 * [Y] 4-6,9-11,13,14;
 [XA]US2006060100  (THIENARD REGIS [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,7,8 * figure 1; claims 4-6 * [A] 3;
 [Y]US2011222948  (ASADA TETSUO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 4-6,9,10,13,14 * figures 3a, 5a, 7 *;
 [YA]US2006197819  (MATSUI TOSHIHARU [JP]) [Y] 5 * figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6-18;
 [YD]JP2005053016  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [YD] 18 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003029339  (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0047]; figure 5, *
by applicantJP2005053016