Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2783869 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2783869



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 310
13.06.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.08.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.07.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.07.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
02.07.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
02.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
22.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
16.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
05.02.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.08.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.08.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
08.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
11.02.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
11.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
11.02.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
17.08.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
10.07.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
01.07.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
27.03.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2014 Description Search / examination 34
07.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 18
07.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4