Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2783869


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
14.06.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
06.07.2018 (Expected) grant published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
04.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.07.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.02.2016 Change - designated states published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
19.02.2016 Change - request for examination published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
15.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
10.07.2015 Publication of search report published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]