Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2778512

EP2778512 - Lightguide with horizontal cutoff and horizontal spread [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.09.2015  [2015/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Lighting Systems North America L.L.C.
1231 A Avenue North
Seymour, IN 47274 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Potter, Brant
2353 Fairfax Drive
Columbus, IN 47203 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Laroche, Didier
Valeo Vision
Propriété Industrielle
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date14158660.210.03.2014
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS20131382713314.03.2013         Original published format: US201313827133
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2778512
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/10, F21V8/00, G02B19/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Lichtleiter mit horizontale Unterbrechung und horizontaler Ausbreitung[2014/38]
English:Lightguide with horizontal cutoff and horizontal spread[2014/38]
French:Guide d'onde optique avec coupure et étalement horizontaux[2014/38]
Examination procedure13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
18.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/37]
23.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/37]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2474779  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0032] - [0042] - [0044] *;
 [Y]EP2045515  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] , [0029] - [0031] - [0036] - [0039] - [0053] * * figures 1-17; claims 1,2,4,6,9,10, 13 *;
 [A]US2005162857  (TSUKAMOTO MICHIO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-12; claims 1,3,7-9 *;
 [A]US2006087860  (ISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE102011018508  (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-7; claims 1,9,14 *;
 [A]EP2322848  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,10,15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0769653  (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008013333  (KOIZUMI HIROYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9,15 * abstract *
by applicantUS7607811
 US7661860
 EP1992868
 EP1895228
 US2009135621
 US2009091944
 US2006285347
 US6945672