blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2778512 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410231202 EP14158660



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9541248Global Dossier 10.01.2017B2
US2016084463 24.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514955357 01.12.2015
US201313827133 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9222637Global Dossier 29.12.2015B2
US2014268847 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313827133 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104048265Global Dossier 17.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313827133 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2778512Global Dossier 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313827133 14.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202014010486U 28.09.2015U1
Priority number Date
US201313827133 14.03.2013