blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2779071 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410097561 EP14158721



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014279028Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313844401 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104049873Global Dossier 17.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313844401 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2779071Global Dossier 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313844401 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2846528 15.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313844401 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1199317 26.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313844401 15.03.2013